OK SB948 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying wrecker rates and fee calculations. Emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying wrecker rates and fee calculations. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-17 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-04 | Rereferred to Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2009-02-11 | coauthored by Wright (Harold) (principal House author) | |
2009-02-11 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-11 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-09 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Barrington | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 953 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 953 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 961 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb948&Session=1000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2009-10bills/SB/sb948_int.rtf |