OK SB89 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB89
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Open Records Act; requiring written notice when records request cannot be completed within a specified time. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Open Records Act; requiring written notice when records request cannot be completed within a specified time. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Kirt [D] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kirt |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB89 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed