OK SB766 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; directing the State Department of Education to adopt readiness standards for high school level preparation for middle school students. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; directing the State Department of Education to adopt readiness standards for high school level preparation for middle school students. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2009-03-10 | First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-09 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 4 | |
2009-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 5 | |
2009-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Hilliard (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-19 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-12 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Hilliard | |
2009-02-11 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Paddack | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |