OK SB749 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB749
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; authorizing funding for infrastructure projects pursuant to Public-Private Partner Development Pool. Effective date.
Title
Public finance; authorizing funding for infrastructure projects pursuant to Public-Private Partner Development Pool. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Rader [R] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Rep. Toni Hasenbeck [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] |
Sen. Dewayne Pemberton [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill |
2019-04-24 | House | General Order |
2019-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB749 (Carry Over) 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019