OK SB714 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; expanding tax refund intercept claimants. Emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; expanding tax refund intercept claimants. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-02 | First Reading | |
2009-03-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-02-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-26 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2009-02-26 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Banz (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Banz | |
2009-02-10 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Aldridge | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |