OK SB707 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-18 - Rescinded naming of Senate conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-18 - Rescinded naming of Senate conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; directing the State Board of Education to adopt requirements for high school graduation.
Title
Schools; directing the State Board of Education to adopt requirements for high school graduation.
Sponsors
Sen. John Ford [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. Michael Mazzei [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Rescinded naming of Senate conferees |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Rescinded rejection of HAs |
2015-04-29 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2015-04-27 | Senate | coauthored by Sharp |
2015-04-27 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2015-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Amended |
2015-04-22 | House | General Order |
2015-03-17 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-03-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Brinkley |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | coauthored by Brinkley |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2015-02-16 | Senate | coauthored by Mazzei |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 11 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 508 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 523 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 528 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 529 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |