OK SB559 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Assault; allowing prosecution for certain offenses; providing penalties and affirmative defense. Effective date.
Title
Assault; allowing prosecution for certain offenses; providing penalties and affirmative defense. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-03 | Senate | coauthored by Hall (principal House author) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Marlatt |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |