OK SB539 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Criminal procedure; relating to the victims and witnesses rights; expanding scope of rights; stating certain duty of law enforcement officer; providing written victim notification; Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Criminal procedure; relating to the victims and witnesses rights; expanding scope of rights; stating certain duty of law enforcement officer; providing written victim notification; Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Sen. Jim Reynolds [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-13 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/11/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-05 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-05-05 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-04 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-04 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-14 | HAs read | |
2009-04-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-13 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 8; Ayes: 89 Nays: 8 | |
2009-04-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson, Kern | |
2009-04-13 | General Order | |
2009-04-02 | Title restored | |
2009-04-02 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2009-03-05 | First Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-04 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-04 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Tibbs (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Tibbs | |
2009-02-10 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Reynolds | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 215 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 984 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 984 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |