OK SB503 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education; implementation of certain statutory requirements; granting certain authority to board to ensure compliance. Emergency.
Title
Higher education; implementation of certain statutory requirements; granting certain authority to board to ensure compliance. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Rep. Danny Williams [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Rep. Sherrie Conley [R] | Rep. Denise Hader [R] | Rep. Jim Olsen [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 68 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 68 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-05-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 13 |
2022-04-28 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2022-04-28 | House | House Rule suspended |
2022-04-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley, CrosswhiteHader, Williams, Echols, Olsen |
2022-04-28 | House | General Order |
2022-04-20 | House | Remove Representative Martinez as principal House author and substitute with Representative McBride |
2021-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2021-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB503 (Carry Over) 2021-04-06 - CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee