OK SB370 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Accounting; providing exception for succession of business by sale or transfer; requiring certain notice. Effective date.
Title
Accounting; providing exception for succession of business by sale or transfer; requiring certain notice. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. Jim Halligan [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House: Banking and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House: Banking and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/01/2015 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-28 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-14 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-13 | House | General Order |
2015-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking and Financial Services Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Financial Services |
2015-03-16 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2015-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Halligan |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 15 | 15A | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 15 | 15B | New Code | See Bill Text |