OK SB322 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB322
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Indian child custody proceedings; certain notice requirements. Effective date.
Title
Indian child custody proceedings; certain notice requirements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | General Order |
2017-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | coauthored by Biggs (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB322 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017