OK SB268 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB268
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Coauthored by Senator Boggs
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Coauthored by Senator Boggs
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma National Guard; establishing eligibility for workers' compensation benefits under certain circumstances. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma National Guard; establishing eligibility for workers' compensation benefits under certain circumstances. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boggs |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Boggs; authored by Senator Sykes |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boggs |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB268 (Carry Over) 2017-03-07 - Coauthored by Senator Boggs