OK SB2263 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; relating to Sex Offenders Registration Act; providing exception to registration. Effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; relating to Sex Offenders Registration Act; providing exception to registration. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 19 | |
2010-03-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-18 | coauthored by Hoskin (principal House author) | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-17 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-15 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Hoskin | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Wyrick | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1021 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 582 | New Code | See Bill Text |