OK SB2219 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; authorizing certain pilot program. Effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; authorizing certain pilot program. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Earl Garrison [D] | Rep. Rebecca Hamilton [D] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Sen. Todd Lamb [R] |
Sen. Debbe Leftwich [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-09 | coauthored by Leftwich, Garrison, Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Hamilton (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Remove as author Senator Bingman; authored by Senator Lamb | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Hamilton | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-11 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | |
2010-02-11 | Withdrawn from Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary committee | |
2010-02-08 | Pending removal author Senator Bingman and replace with Senator Lamb | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Bingman | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |