OK SB2182 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services
Pending: House Economic Development and Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services
Pending: House Economic Development and Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; relating to Electrical Licensing Act and Mechanical Licensing Act; providing for a reduction in fee. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Professions and occupations; relating to Electrical Licensing Act and Mechanical Licensing Act; providing for a reduction in fee. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Carey [D] | Sen. Todd Lamb [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Carey (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Remove as author Senator Bingman; authored by Senator Lamb | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Labor committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Carey | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Labor committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Business and Labor | |
2010-02-10 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2010-02-08 | Pending removal author Senator Bingman and replace with Senator Lamb | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Bingman | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1685 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1688 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 1850 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |