OK SB1999 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; providing animal husbandry exemption; including teeth floating and farriery acts of animal husbandry. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Professions and occupations; providing animal husbandry exemption; including teeth floating and farriery acts of animal husbandry. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Brian Crain [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Agriculture and Rural Development Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 | |
2010-03-10 | Remove as author Senator Schulz; authored by Senator Crain | |
2010-03-10 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-10 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Pending removal author Senator Schulz and replace with Senator Crain | |
2010-02-10 | coauthored by Armes (principal House author) | |
2010-02-10 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-09 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-09 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Armes | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Schulz | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 698 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 698 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |