OK SB1948 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services
Pending: House Economic Development and Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services
Pending: House Economic Development and Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Fair Pay for Construction Act; modifying definitions. Effective date.
Title
Fair Pay for Construction Act; modifying definitions. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-02 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-02 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Martin (Scott) (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass Business and Labor committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Martin (Scott) | |
2010-02-09 | Reported Do Pass Business and Labor committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Business and Labor | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coates | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |