OK SB1899 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - coauthored by Blackwell (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - coauthored by Blackwell (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Corporation Commission; directing Commission to make report relating to electric transmission. Emergency.
Title
Corporation Commission; directing Commission to make report relating to electric transmission. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Blackwell (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass Energy and Environment committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Blackwell | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass Energy and Environment committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Environment | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Schulz | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1899&Session=1000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2009-10bills/SB/sb1899_int.rtf |