OK SB1806 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public Finance; relating to payroll deductions; creating the Oklahoma Paycheck Protection Act. Effective date.
Title
Public Finance; relating to payroll deductions; creating the Oklahoma Paycheck Protection Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1806&Session=1400 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2013-14bills/SB/sb1806_int.rtf |