OK SB172 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: House General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: House General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Municipal street improvement procedures; modifying petition procedures; modifying certain notification requirements. Effective date.
Title
Municipal street improvement procedures; modifying petition procedures; modifying certain notification requirements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 | |
2011-03-14 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 | |
2011-03-10 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Ballenger | |
2011-03-10 | Measure failed: Ayes: 18 Nays: 22 | |
2011-03-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Derby (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Ballenger | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 36 | 202 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 36 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 36 | 204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 36 | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 36 | 206 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 36 | 207 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 36 | 208 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 36 | 209 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 36 | 211 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 36 | 212 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 36 | 213 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 36 | 214 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 36 | 223 | New Code | See Bill Text |