OK SB1154 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor carriers; requiring certain approval of enforcement officers. Effective date.
Title
Motor carriers; requiring certain approval of enforcement officers. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |