OK SB1134 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; requiring Regents for Higher Education to inform all members of legislature of certain proposed projects. Effective date.
Title
Public finance; requiring Regents for Higher Education to inform all members of legislature of certain proposed projects. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Murphey (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to General Government | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Anderson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |