OK SB1120 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Department of Human Services; budgeting in certain categories; lapse dates. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Human Services; budgeting in certain categories; lapse dates. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-31SenateApproved by Governor 05/31/2013
2013-05-24SenateSent to Governor
2013-05-24HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2013-05-24SenateEnrolled, to House
2013-05-24SenateReferred for enrollment
2013-05-24HouseTo Senate
2013-05-24HouseMotion expired
2013-05-22HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Nelson
2013-05-22HouseEmergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1
2013-05-22HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Nelson
2013-05-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
2013-05-22HouseJCR adopted
2013-05-22HouseGeneral Order
2013-05-21HouseSecond Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
2013-05-20HouseFirst Reading
2013-05-20SenateEngrossed to House
2013-05-16SenateReferred for engrossment
2013-05-16SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
2013-05-16SenateJCR adopted
2013-05-15SenateEmergency added
2013-05-15SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
2013-05-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2013-05-01Senatecoauthored by Newell
2013-05-01Senatecoauthored by Martin (Scott) (principal House author)
2013-05-01Senatecoauthored by Justice
2013-05-01SenateAuthored by Senator Jolley
2013-05-01SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback