OK HB3727 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring students in the third through fifth grades to receive instruction in cursive handwriting; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; requiring students in the third through fifth grades to receive instruction in cursive handwriting; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Lowe [D] | Sen. Kevin Matthews [D] | Rep. Regina Goodwin [D] | Rep. Tammy West [R] |
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] | Sen. Blake Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Goodwin |
2024-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 8 |
2024-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy) |
2024-03-06 | House | General Order |
2024-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Matthews (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Lowe (Jason) |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |