OK HB3288 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Economic development; creating the Task Force on the Oklahoma Quality Investment Act. Emergency.
Title
Economic development; creating the Task Force on the Oklahoma Quality Investment Act. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 18 | |
2010-03-10 | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fields | |
2010-03-10 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative McNiel | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 48 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 4211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |