OK HB3239 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Driving under the influence; creating a Qualified DUI Municipal Court Not of Record for certain municipalities; effective date.
Title
Driving under the influence; creating a Qualified DUI Municipal Court Not of Record for certain municipalities; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | Remove Representative Culver as principal House author and substitute with Representative Lawson |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2024-02-07 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-06 | House | Remove Representative Lawson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Culver |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Lawson |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |