OK HB2915 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Cannaday
Pending: Senate Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Cannaday
Pending: Senate Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Property; Groundwater Severance Restriction Act; effective date.
Title
Property; Groundwater Severance Restriction Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Cannaday | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2012-03-06 | First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-05 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 5 | |
2012-03-05 | Considered | |
2012-03-05 | Laid over | |
2012-03-05 | Amended | |
2012-03-05 | General Order | |
2012-02-15 | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-15 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Richardson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
52 | 320 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 60 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |