OK HB2676 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Transportation funding; making an appropriation to the County Improvements for Roads and Bridges Fund; noncodification; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation funding; making an appropriation to the County Improvements for Roads and Bridges Fund; noncodification; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseApproved by Governor 04/22/2019
2019-04-17HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-17SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-17HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-16HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-16SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-16SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2019-04-16SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-20SenateReported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Perryman
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Sims
2019-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Grego
2019-02-20SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-19HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-19HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
2019-02-19HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Sanders, Luttrell, Ortega
2019-02-19HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-14HouseEmergency added
2019-02-14HouseAuthored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
2019-02-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader, Phillips, Tadlock, Hilbert, Kerbs, Newton, Lawson, Russ, West (Josh), Caldwell (Trey), Fetgatter, Pfeiffer
2019-02-14HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-11HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback