OK HB2676 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2676
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation funding; making an appropriation to the County Improvements for Roads and Bridges Fund; effective date; emergency.
Title
Transportation funding; making an appropriation to the County Improvements for Roads and Bridges Fund; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Perryman |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sims |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Grego |
2019-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sanders, Luttrell, Ortega |
2019-02-19 | House | General Order |
2019-02-14 | House | Emergency added |
2019-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader, Phillips, Tadlock, Hilbert, Kerbs, Newton, Lawson, Russ, West (Josh), Caldwell (Trey), Fetgatter, Pfeiffer |
2019-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-11 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2676 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2019