OK HB2634 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Birth and adoption records; creating the Truth in Adoption Act; effective date.
Title
Birth and adoption records; creating the Truth in Adoption Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Burrage [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading | |
2012-03-13 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-12 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-12 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker, Hoskin, McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2012-03-12 | General Order | |
2012-02-28 | Authored by Senator Burrage (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-28 | Remove Representative Walker as principal House author and substitute with Representative Sherrer | |
2012-02-28 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-20 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-20 | Withdrawn from Human Services Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Human Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Walker | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 7504 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 323 | New Code | See Bill Text |