OK HB2582 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; changing benefit plan to fiscal year. Effective date.
Title
State government; changing benefit plan to fiscal year. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 | |
2010-03-08 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-08 | Amended | |
2010-03-08 | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-08 | General Order | |
2010-02-09 | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Thomsen | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |