OK HB2574 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; requiring registrants to check information in central repository; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; requiring registrants to check information in central repository; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2012-03-12 | First Reading | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-08 | Motion expired | |
2012-03-06 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Ownbey | |
2012-03-06 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 26 | |
2012-03-06 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-06 | Amended | |
2012-03-06 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Ownbey | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |