OK HB2561 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Tibbs, Wesselhoft, Peterson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Tibbs, Wesselhoft, Peterson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Human trafficking; adding and modifying definitions. Emergency.
Title
Human trafficking; adding and modifying definitions. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Brown [D] | Rep. Marian Cooksey [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Bill Nations [D] |
Rep. Charles Ortega [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Tibbs, Wesselhoft, Peterson | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-02 | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-02 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nations, Kern, Ortega | |
2010-03-02 | General Order | |
2010-02-16 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Cooksey | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 748 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 748 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 1402 | New Code | See Bill Text |