OK HB2406 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Environmental Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Environmental Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; relating to Clean Air Act permit fees; prohibiting fees and permitting of emergency engines to be based on the potential to emit; effective date.
Title
Environment and natural resources; relating to Clean Air Act permit fees; prohibiting fees and permitting of emergency engines to be based on the potential to emit; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House: Environmental Law Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Environmental Law Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred to Environmental Law |
2016-02-16 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Faught |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |