OK HB2185 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco Settlement Endowment Trust Fund; requiring unsolicited proposals to be subject to certain acts; effective date.
Title
Tobacco Settlement Endowment Trust Fund; requiring unsolicited proposals to be subject to certain acts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Approved by Governor 04/20/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-14 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-05 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |