OK HB2100 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Pharmacies; requiring license for pharmacy benefits management; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacies; requiring license for pharmacy benefits management; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-06 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-12HouseApproved by Governor 05/12/2014
2014-05-07HouseSent to Governor
2014-05-07SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2014-05-07HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2014-05-06HouseReferred for enrollment
2014-05-06HouseMeasure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1
2014-05-06HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Simpson
2014-05-06HouseSA's read, adopted
2014-04-07HouseSA's received
2014-04-07SenateEngrossed to House
2014-04-03Senatecoauthored by Schulz
2014-04-03SenateReferred for engrossment
2014-04-03SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
2014-04-03SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2014-04-02Senatecoauthored by Newberry, Fields, Barrington
2014-03-27SenateDirect to Calendar
2014-03-27SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations committee
2014-03-27SenateReferred to Appropriations
2014-03-27SenateEmergency added
2014-03-27SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2013-04-02Senatecoauthored by Perryman
2013-03-21SenateSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2013-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2013-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2013-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2013-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 18
2013-03-13HouseAmended
2013-03-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Pittman
2013-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2013-02-25HouseAuthored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
2013-02-25HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2013-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2013-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Derby
2013-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
593601Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback