OK HB2100 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - coauthored by Perryman
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - coauthored by Perryman
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Pharmacies; requiring license for pharmacy benefits management; effective date.
Title
Pharmacies; requiring license for pharmacy benefits management; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | coauthored by Perryman |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 18 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amended |
2013-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2013-03-13 | House | General Order |
2013-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Derby |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |