OK HB2034 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; providing an income tax credit for qualified public transportation expenditures. Effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; providing an income tax credit for qualified public transportation expenditures. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2009-03-12 | First Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 7 | |
2009-03-11 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2009-03-11 | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker | |
2009-03-11 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-26 | Remove Representative Steele as principal House author and substitute with Representative Pruett | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-02-23 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Steele | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 1370 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1370 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | 2A | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 99 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2701 | New Code | See Bill Text |