OK HB2029 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2029
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oil and gas; ratification or approval of unitization plan by lessees and owners; royalty interest exclusion; royalty ownership; emergency.
Title
Oil and gas; ratification or approval of unitization plan by lessees and owners; royalty interest exclusion; royalty ownership; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/24/2021 |
2021-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2021-05-17 | Senate | CCR read |
2021-05-17 | House | To Senate |
2021-05-17 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3 |
2021-05-17 | House | CCR adopted |
2021-05-12 | House | Emergency added |
2021-05-12 | House | Title restored |
2021-05-12 | House | CCR submitted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Taylor, Allen, Bullard, Murdock, Boren, Hicks |
2021-05-03 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Energy and Natural Resources |
2021-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2021-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-02 | House | General Order |
2021-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative ODonnell |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2029 (Carry Over) 2021-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2021