OK HB1989 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Records; creating the Student Data Accessibility, Transparency and Accountability Act of 2013; effective date; emergency.
Title
Records; creating the Student Data Accessibility, Transparency and Accountability Act of 2013; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. David Brumbaugh [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] |
Rep. Jason Murphey [R] | Rep. Seneca Scott [D] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] |
Rep. Justin Wood [R] | Rep. Ken Walker [R] | Rep. Michael Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-16 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-16 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-16 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 |
2013-05-16 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-14 | House | Title restored |
2013-05-14 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jolley |
2013-05-14 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-07 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Government Modernization |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Griffin, Ford, Brinkley, Garrison, Paddack |
2013-05-06 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | coauthored by Turner, Walker, Wood |
2013-03-25 | Senate | coauthored by Murphey |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-03-13 | Senate | coauthored by Scott |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern, Ritze |
2013-03-11 | House | General Order |
2013-03-04 | House | Emergency added |
2013-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson |
2013-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Brumbaugh |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 1 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 163 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 168 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |