OK HB1686 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; providing for bidding preference based upon employer providing health care for employees.
Title
State government; providing for bidding preference based upon employer providing health care for employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Motion expired | |
2010-02-23 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 45 | |
2010-02-23 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Scott | |
2010-02-23 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 42 | |
2010-02-23 | Amended | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Dorman | |
2010-02-23 | General Order | |
2010-02-16 | Emergency added | |
2010-02-16 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Scott | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |