OK HB1616 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Mental health; specifying procedures for emergency detention of persons appearing to be mentally ill, alcohol dependent, or drug dependent; specifying procedures when a person is medically unstable. Effective date.
Title
Mental health; specifying procedures for emergency detention of persons appearing to be mentally ill, alcohol dependent, or drug dependent; specifying procedures when a person is medically unstable. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-14 - House - House: (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by Governor 05/22/2009 | |
2009-05-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-18 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-05-18 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-05-15 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-15 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-15 | CCR adopted | |
2009-05-14 | CCR read | |
2009-05-14 | To Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-14 | CCR adopted | |
2009-05-12 | Enacting clause restored | |
2009-05-12 | Title restored | |
2009-05-12 | CCR submitted | |
2009-05-06 | HC's named: Sullivan, Peters, Duncan, Kiesel, Trebilcock | |
2009-05-05 | Conference granted, SCs named Crain, Jolley, Newberry, Halligan, Nichols, Gumm | |
2009-04-27 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-14 | SA's received | |
2009-04-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-04-02 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-02 | Title stricken | |
2009-04-02 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-26 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2009-03-05 | First Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-04 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2 | |
2009-03-04 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | Authored by Senator Crain (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Sullivan | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |