OK HB1395 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-11)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School financial disclosures; subjecting virtual charter school to same financial reporting requirements as school districts; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School financial disclosures; subjecting virtual charter school to same financial reporting requirements as school districts; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseApproved by Governor 05/02/2019
2019-04-29HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-29SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-29HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-25HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-24SenateMotion expired
2019-04-24SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Dahm
2019-04-24SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2019-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-02SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2019-03-14SenateCoauthored by Senator Sharp
2019-03-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Davis
2019-03-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Mize
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Ranson, Kerbs, McDugle, Sims, Fetgatter, Nollan, Pae, Virgin, Hasenbeck, Baker, Fugate, Stark, Blancett, Humphrey, Sterling, Munson, Boles, Kiger, Hilbert, Sneed
2019-03-13HouseRemove as coauthor Representative(s) Mize
2019-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-20HouseEmergency added
2019-02-20HouseAuthored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
2019-02-20HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Vancuren, Lawson, McEntire, Bush, Conley, Fincher, Provenzano, Burns, Hardin (David), Loring, Caldwell (Trey), Phillips, May, Johns, Brewer, Nichols, Mize, Boatman, Rosecrants, Cornwell, Luttrell, West (Tammy), Waldron, Ford, Manger
2019-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Dills
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback