OK HB1362 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Marriage and family; prohibiting entities from requiring, requesting or using social security numbers for marriage license applications. Effective date.
Title
Marriage and family; prohibiting entities from requiring, requesting or using social security numbers for marriage license applications. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-02-23 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-23 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-03 | Authored by Senator Brogdon (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-03 | General Order | |
2009-02-24 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Cooksey | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |