OK HB1121 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-26 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-26 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; State Budget Reform Act of 2017; effective date.
Title
Public finance; State Budget Reform Act of 2017; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-26 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-09-25 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2017-09-25 | House | First Reading |