OH SB263 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-12)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective 4/12/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-12)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective 4/12/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 5164.751 and 5167.01 and to enact sections 3902.50, 3902.51, 4729.49, and 5167.123 of the Revised Code to prohibit a pharmacy benefit manager from taking certain actions with respect to reimbursements made to health care providers that participate in the federal 340B Drug Pricing Program.
Title
Prohibit pharmacy benefit managers acting on certain reimbursals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 77 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Effective 4/12/21 | |
2020-12-17 | House | Passed |
2020-12-14 | House | Reported: Health |
2020-12-08 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2020-12-03 | House | Introduced |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Passed |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Finance |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 02 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 02 | 51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 29 | 49 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 64 | 751 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 67 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 67 | 123 | New Code | See Bill Text |