OH SB178 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Enrolled on November 19 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-11-19 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 4731.512 of the Revised Code regarding the authority of podiatrists to administer influenza vaccinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards podiatrist authority to administer flu vaccine

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19HousePassed
2020-11-12HouseReported: Health
2020-05-12HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2020-05-05HouseIntroduced
2020-02-12SenatePassed
2020-01-31SenateReported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-09-11SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-07-17SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
47New CodeSee Bill Text
4731New CodeSee Bill Text
4731512New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback