OH HB95 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-10-24 - Reported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4511.03, 4511.051, 4511.12, 4511.121, 4511.132, 4511.204, 4511.205, 4511.21, 4511.211, 4511.213, 4511.22, 4511.23, 4511.25, 4511.26, 4511.27, 4511.28, 4511.29, 4511.30, 4511.31, 4511.32, 4511.33, 4511.34, 4511.35, 4511.36, 4511.37, 4511.38, 4511.39, 4511.40, 4511.41, 4511.42, 4511.43, 4511.431, 4511.44, 4511.441, 4511.451, 4511.46, 4511.47, 4511.54, 4511.55, 4511.57, 4511.58, 4511.59, 4511.60, 4511.61, 4511.64, 4511.71, 4511.711, 4511.712, 4511.713, 4511.72, and 4511.73 and to enact section 4511.991 of the Revised Code to establish an enhanced penalty for committing a moving violation while distracted if the distraction is a contributing factor to the commission of the violation and to reenact provisions of law that specified that certain electronic wireless communications device violations were allied offenses of similar import.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhance penalty for moving violations while distracted

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-24SenateReported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-06-28SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-06-22SenateIntroduced
2017-06-21HousePassed
2017-05-18HouseReported - Substitute: Transportation and Public Safety
2017-03-07HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2017-02-27HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4511Amended CodeCitation Text
451103Amended CodeCitation Text
4511051Amended CodeCitation Text
451112Amended CodeCitation Text
4511121Amended CodeCitation Text
4511132Amended CodeCitation Text
4511204Amended CodeCitation Text
4511205Amended CodeCitation Text
451121Amended CodeCitation Text
4511211Amended CodeCitation Text
4511213Amended CodeCitation Text
451122Amended CodeCitation Text
451123Amended CodeCitation Text
451125Amended CodeCitation Text
451126Amended CodeCitation Text
451127Amended CodeCitation Text
451128Amended CodeCitation Text
451129Amended CodeCitation Text
451130Amended CodeCitation Text
451131Amended CodeCitation Text
451132Amended CodeCitation Text
451133Amended CodeCitation Text
451134Amended CodeCitation Text
451135Amended CodeCitation Text
451136Amended CodeCitation Text
451137Amended CodeCitation Text
451138Amended CodeCitation Text
451139Amended CodeCitation Text
451140Amended CodeCitation Text
451141Amended CodeCitation Text
451142Amended CodeCitation Text
451143Amended CodeCitation Text
4511431Amended CodeCitation Text
451144Amended CodeCitation Text
4511441Amended CodeCitation Text
4511451Amended CodeCitation Text
451146Amended CodeCitation Text
451147Amended CodeCitation Text
451154Amended CodeCitation Text
451155Amended CodeCitation Text
451157Amended CodeCitation Text
451158Amended CodeCitation Text
451159Amended CodeCitation Text
451160Amended CodeCitation Text
451161Amended CodeCitation Text
451164Amended CodeCitation Text
451171Amended CodeCitation Text
4511711Amended CodeCitation Text
4511712Amended CodeCitation Text
4511713Amended CodeCitation Text
451172Amended CodeCitation Text
451173Amended CodeCitation Text
4511991New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback