NY S09421 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10343
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10343
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires insurance policies which cover certain water or water-borne material damage also cover certain damage caused directly or indirectly by an excluded peril contributing concurrently or in any sequence.
Title
Requires insurance policies which cover certain water or water-borne material damage also cover certain damage caused directly or indirectly by an excluded peril contributing concurrently or in any sequence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10343 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1262 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10343 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY