NY S09366 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the application of certain provisions relating to commercial financing; provides that liability shall not be imposed on a provider if the actual annual percentage rate charged by the provider differs from the estimated annual percentage rate disclosed by the provider acting in good faith.
Title
Relates to the application of certain provisions relating to commercial financing; provides that liability shall not be imposed on a provider if the actual annual percentage rate charged by the provider differs from the estimated annual percentage rate disclosed by the provider acting in good faith.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9463 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1303 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A09463 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES